This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/26/2023 at 18:06:14 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS ROB J GIBBS

Case Summary

On 11/07/2022 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROB J GIBBS. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********20AX

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

ROB J GIBBS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASHLEY LUCIA BLANCO

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/07/2022 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/07/2022 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM- EXHIBIT A CARDMEMBER AGREEMENT / EXHIBIT B ACCOUBT SUMMARY

11/07/2022 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM- EXHIBIT A CARDMEMBER AGREEMENT / EXHIBIT B ACCOUBT SUMMARY

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO BE ISSUED TO ROB J GIBBS - ISSUED 12/19/2022

12/15/2022 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO BE ISSUED TO ROB J GIBBS - ISSUED 12/19/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • Hearing01/23/2023 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketUpdated Event PTC on 1/23/2023 0900 AM Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS results CONTINUED on 1/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING PLAINTIFF - PRESENT, REPRESENTED BY MARILYN DIRKS, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT - NOT PRESENT NO PROOF CONTINUE FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $195.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1087464; Tender Amount: $185.00; Receipt Number: 1097985; Tender Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketEvent PTC scheduled on 1/23/2023 at 0900 AM, JC - Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS presiding. EventID 1492534

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1097985

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00 AssessmentID 12009924

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO BE ISSUED TO ROB J GIBBS - ISSUED 12/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $195.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1087464; Tender Amount: $185.00; Receipt Number: 1097985; Tender Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1087464

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 11/8/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED. AS OF NOVEMBER 2022 PRETRIAL CONFERENCES ARE BACK TO IN-PERSON HEARINGS. PLEASE VISIT OUR WEBSITE TO OBTAIN CORRECT NOTICE TO APPEAR AT A HEARING IN-PERSON NOT VIA ZOOM. DO NOT PAY FEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM- EXHIBIT A CARDMEMBER AGREEMENT / EXHIBIT B ACCOUBT SUMMARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 11/8/2022 - id number 2453342

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00 AssessmentID 11991303

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketCase 412022SC006420SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 11/7/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less