This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/26/2023 at 18:06:25 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS MARY WHITNEY

Case Summary

On 11/07/2022 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARY WHITNEY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********22AX

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

MARY WHITNEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASHLEY LUCIA BLANCO

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/07/2022 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/07/2022 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM- EXHIBIT A CARDMEMBER AGREEMENT / EXHIBIT B ACCOUNT SUMMARY

11/07/2022 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM- EXHIBIT A CARDMEMBER AGREEMENT / EXHIBIT B ACCOUNT SUMMARY

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO BE ISSUED TO MARY WHITNEY - ISSUED 12/19/2022

12/15/2022 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO BE ISSUED TO MARY WHITNEY - ISSUED 12/19/2022

RETURN OF SERVICE/ SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED/ MARY WHITNEY

01/31/2023 - RETURN OF SERVICE/ SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED/ MARY WHITNEY

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE/ SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED/ MARY WHITNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • Hearing01/23/2023 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketUpdated Event PTC on 1/23/2023 0900 AM Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS results CONTINUED on 1/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING PLAINTIFF - PRESENT, REPRESENTED BY MARILYN DIRKS, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT - NOT PRESENT NO PROOF CONTINUE FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 3 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $330.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1087479; Tender Amount: $310.00; Receipt Number: 1097972; Tender Amount: $10.00; Receipt Number: 1100828; Tender Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1100828

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $10.00 AssessmentID 12014470

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 3 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $330.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1087479; Tender Amount: $310.00; Receipt Number: 1097972; Tender Amount: $10.00; Receipt Number: 1100828; Tender Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketEvent PTC scheduled on 1/23/2023 at 0900 AM, JC - Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS presiding. EventID 1492531

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1097972

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 3 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $330.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1087479; Tender Amount: $310.00; Receipt Number: 1097972; Tender Amount: $10.00; Receipt Number: 1100828; Tender Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1087479

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 11/8/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED. AS OF NOVEMBER 2022 PRETRIAL CONFERENCES ARE BACK TO IN-PERSON HEARINGS. PLEASE VISIT OUR WEBSITE TO OBTAIN CORRECT NOTICE TO APPEAR AT A HEARING IN-PERSON NOT VIA ZOOM. DO NOT PAY FEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM- EXHIBIT A CARDMEMBER AGREEMENT / EXHIBIT B ACCOUNT SUMMARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 11/8/2022 - id number 2453358

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00 AssessmentID 11991326

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketCase 412022SC006422SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 11/7/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less