This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/19/2020 at 14:18:13 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS LATIFFINI HAMER

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 DISCOVER BANK filed an Other lawsuit against LATIFFINI HAMER. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********21AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

LATIFFINI HAMER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ERIK ZOGG

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

02/24/2020 - DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

SUMMONS SERVED LATIFFINI HAMER ON 02/04/2020

02/10/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED LATIFFINI HAMER ON 02/04/2020

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: LATIFFINI HAMER 01/23/2020

01/22/2020 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: LATIFFINI HAMER 01/23/2020

COMPLAINT

01/22/2020 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED LATIFFINI HAMER ON 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$310.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797015; Tender Amount: $310.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT EXHIBIT A CARDMEMBER AGREEMENT / EXHIBIT B ACCOUNT SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: LATIFFINI HAMER 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less