This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/30/2020 at 14:19:34 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS KEVIN A FUNK

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 DISCOVER BANK filed an Other lawsuit against KEVIN A FUNK. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********20AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

KEVIN A FUNK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ERIK ZOGG

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

06/10/2020 - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVED KEVIN A FUNK

03/03/2020 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVED KEVIN A FUNK

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: KEVIN A FUNK 01/23/2020

01/22/2020 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: KEVIN A FUNK 01/23/2020

COMPLAINT

01/22/2020 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVED KEVIN A FUNK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$310.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797012; Tender Amount: $310.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT CARDMEMBER AGREEMENT / EXHIBIT B ACCOUNT SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: KEVIN A FUNK 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less