This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 09/04/2021 at 23:06:19 (UTC).

DIANNE HAYWARD Et Al VS FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 DIANNE HAYWARD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********73AX

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SARASOTA PHYSICAL MEDICINE INC

DIANNE HAYWARD

Defendant

FARMERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHONY D BARAK

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

08/09/2021 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED TO FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON AUGUST 6TH 2021

08/06/2021 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED TO FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON AUGUST 6TH 2021

COMPLAINT

06/17/2021 - COMPLAINT

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 6/29/2021

06/17/2021 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 6/29/2021

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/17/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • Hearing08/09/2021 at 01:00PM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED TO FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON AUGUST 6TH 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$65.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 941814; Tender Amount: $65.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 941814

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 7/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2021
  • DocketEvent PTC scheduled on 8/9/2021 at 0100 PM, JC - Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS presiding. EventID 1331516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE ON 6/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT: ASSIGNMENT OF BENEFITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE "EMAIL" ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 6/18/2021 - id number 2250846

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $55.00 AssessmentID 11720168

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCase 412021SC004773SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 6/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SARASOTA PHYSICAL MEDICINE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARAK, ANTHONY