This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 12/30/2022 at 16:43:19 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY VS BARBARA VITALE Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/07/2022 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against BARBARA VITALE. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********61AX

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

Defendants

JAMES A VITALE

BARBARA VITALE

WACHOVIA BANK NA

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

WATERWAY CONDOMINIUM OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SARA BETH COLLINS

 

Court Documents

VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

10/07/2022 - VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

10/07/2022 - VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED: JAMES A VITALE / BARBARA VITALE / WELLS FARGO BANK NA / WATERWAY CONDOMINIUM OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC / UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 / UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2 -- ISSUED 10/7/2022

10/07/2022 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED: JAMES A VITALE / BARBARA VITALE / WELLS FARGO BANK NA / WATERWAY CONDOMINIUM OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC / UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 / UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2 -- ISSUED 10/7/2022

FORM A AND FORM B

10/07/2022 - FORM A AND FORM B

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

10/07/2022 - NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - E-FILED NOTE AND MORTGAGE

10/07/2022 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - E-FILED NOTE AND MORTGAGE

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY CASE

10/25/2022 - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY CASE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

11/15/2022 - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

11/15/2022 - FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 3 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $1,994.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1078234; Tender Amount: $1,905.00; Receipt Number: 1078235; Tender Amount: $70.50; Receipt Number: 1089989; Tender Amount: $18.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1089989

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $18.50 AssessmentID 11996349

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type NCI - FILED was satisfied with Compliance Action - COMPLETED set on 10/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION REVIEWED - INSTRUCTIONAL MEMO SENT TO FILER - MISSING PRECISE LOCATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 3 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $1,994.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1078234; Tender Amount: $1,905.00; Receipt Number: 1078235; Tender Amount: $70.50; Receipt Number: 1089989; Tender Amount: $18.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 3 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $1,994.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1078234; Tender Amount: $1,905.00; Receipt Number: 1078235; Tender Amount: $70.50; Receipt Number: 1089989; Tender Amount: $18.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - E-FILED NOTE AND MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1078235

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $70.50 AssessmentID 11974670

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1078234

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 10/7/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 10/8/2022 - id number 2441511

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $1,905.00 AssessmentID 11974667

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCase 412022CA004161CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 10/7/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wachovia Bank, National Assn is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant