This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 05/18/2023 at 16:05:16 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY Et Al VS DAWN M RITCHIE Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against DAWN M RITCHIE. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********73AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

MORTGAGE PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2007-1

Defendants

DAWN M RITCHIE

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

MANATEE COUNTY CLERK OF THE COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONATHAN IAN MEISELS

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION DEFENDANT(S), TO: THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, DEVISEES, GRANTEE ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHERS WHO. MAY CLATM AN INTEREST IN THE ESTATE OF DEBORAH MCGOVERN, DECEASED,

04/21/2023 - PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION DEFENDANT(S), TO: THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, DEVISEES, GRANTEE ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHERS WHO. MAY CLATM AN INTEREST IN THE ESTATE OF DEBORAH MCGOVERN, DECEASED,

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

04/05/2023 - AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVED UNEXECUTED UNKNOWN HEIRS OF THE ESTATE OF DEBORAH MCGOVERN

03/31/2023 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVED UNEXECUTED UNKNOWN HEIRS OF THE ESTATE OF DEBORAH MCGOVERN

SUMMONS SERVED MANATEE COUNTY CLERK OF THE COURT, MARCH, 2 2023

03/29/2023 - SUMMONS SERVED MANATEE COUNTY CLERK OF THE COURT, MARCH, 2 2023

NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA.STAT. 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION

02/23/2023 - NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA.STAT. 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A - COPY OF ADJUSTABLE RATE NOTE / EXHIBIT B - COPY OF MORTGAGE / EXHIBIT C- HOME AFFORDABLE MODIFICATION AGREEMENT

02/23/2023 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A - COPY OF ADJUSTABLE RATE NOTE / EXHIBIT B - COPY OF MORTGAGE / EXHIBIT C- HOME AFFORDABLE MODIFICATION AGREEMENT

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

02/23/2023 - VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

NOTICE OF ACTION - ESTATE OF DEBORAH MCGOVERN -- ISSUED - MAILED TO BUSINESS OBSERVER FOR PUBLICATION / MAILED TO LAST KNOWN ADDRESS FOR SERVICE 4/12/23

04/05/2023 - NOTICE OF ACTION - ESTATE OF DEBORAH MCGOVERN -- ISSUED - MAILED TO BUSINESS OBSERVER FOR PUBLICATION / MAILED TO LAST KNOWN ADDRESS FOR SERVICE 4/12/23

SUMMONS SERVED DAWN M RITCHIE,MARCH, 24 2023

03/29/2023 - SUMMONS SERVED DAWN M RITCHIE,MARCH, 24 2023

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketRETURN MEMO-NOA - UNKNOWN HEIRS OF DEBORAH MCGOVERN - 6464TH ST CT E ** UNABLE TO FOWARD **

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION DEFENDANT(S), TO: THE UNKNOWN HEIRS, BENEFICIARIES, DEVISEES, GRANTEE ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHERS WHO. MAY CLATM AN INTEREST IN THE ESTATE OF DEBORAH MCGOVERN, DECEASED,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION - ESTATE OF DEBORAH MCGOVERN -- ISSUED - MAILED TO BUSINESS OBSERVER FOR PUBLICATION / MAILED TO LAST KNOWN ADDRESS FOR SERVICE 4/12/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVED UNEXECUTED UNKNOWN HEIRS OF THE ESTATE OF DEBORAH MCGOVERN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED DAWN M RITCHIE,MARCH, 24 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED MANATEE COUNTY CLERK OF THE COURT, MARCH, 2 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE MARCH, 3 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT DAWN M. RITCHIE/ MANATEE COUNTY CLERK OF THE COURT C/O CLERK OF COURT / STATE OF FLORIDA, DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE -- ISSUED 2/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A - COPY OF ADJUSTABLE RATE NOTE / EXHIBIT B - COPY OF MORTGAGE / EXHIBIT C- HOME AFFORDABLE MODIFICATION AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1118402

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 2/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 2/24/2023 - id number 2489776

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $905.00 AssessmentID 12044187

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCase 412023CA000773CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 2/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less