Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 05/10/2021 at 13:21:07 (UTC).

DESIRE NIKOLIC VS ILEANA TEJADA NIKOLIC

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 DESIRE NIKOLIC filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ILEANA TEJADA NIKOLIC. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEVIN BRUNING. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********58AX

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEVIN BRUNING

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DESIRE NIKOLIC

Respondent

ILEANA TEJADA NIKOLIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

EDWARD BRIAN SOBEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM)- ILEANA TEJADA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER- ILEANA NIKOLIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketTWELFTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT FAMILY DIVISION RULES OF COURTROOM ETIQUETTE- ILEANA TEJADA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketANSWER TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDISCLOSURE FROM NONLAWYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketFORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON ILEANA TEJADA-NIKOLIC, ON THE 23RD DAY OF MARCH, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$407.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 900388; Tender Amount: $10.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: ILEANA TEJADA-NIKOLIC 03/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$407.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 900257; Tender Amount: $397.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE DESIRE NIKOLIC, HUSBAND/PETITIONER,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EDWARD BRIAN SOBEL