Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/03/2020 at 03:38:15 (UTC).

DEREK PAKUS Et Al VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 DEREK PAKUS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT A FARRANCE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********43AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT A FARRANCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HOPKINS CLINIC

DEREK PAKUS

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILIP ANDREW MCCORMICK

Defendant Attorney

DAVID MICHAEL BOSSONE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

06/22/2020 - NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

AGREED ORDER THAT THE PTC IS WAIVED AND THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ARE HEREBY INVOKED

03/12/2020 - AGREED ORDER THAT THE PTC IS WAIVED AND THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ARE HEREBY INVOKED

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

03/10/2020 - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

JOINT STIPULATION OF WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

03/09/2020 - JOINT STIPULATION OF WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL BY DAVID M. BOSSONE, ESQ. OBO DEFENDANT, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

03/02/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL BY DAVID M. BOSSONE, ESQ. OBO DEFENDANT, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS SERVED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

02/18/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY 2/5/2020

02/03/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY 2/5/2020

COMPLAINT

02/03/2020 - COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

02/03/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/03/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/03/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • Hearing07/02/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: HEARING HELD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCES MOTIONS TO BE FILED VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • Hearing05/07/2020 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE PER COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Hearing03/30/2020 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FIRM'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE PER COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER THAT THE PTC IS WAIVED AND THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ARE HEREBY INVOKED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL BY DAVID M. BOSSONE, ESQ. OBO DEFENDANT, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$65.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 801368; Tender Amount: $65.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY 2/5/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCORMICK PHILIP A