Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 03/21/2021 at 23:00:22 (UTC).

DEMMERICK RICHARDSON Et Al VS PROFESSIONAL DEBT MEDIATION

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 DEMMERICK RICHARDSON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROFESSIONAL DEBT MEDIATION. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MELISSA GOULD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********23AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MELISSA GOULD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DEMMERICK RICHARDSON

TAFFY LOPEZ

Defendant

PROFESSIONAL DEBT MEDIATION

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/26/2021 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • Hearing04/05/2021 at 10:30AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO PROFESSIONAL DEBT MEDIATION SERVING JOE KOHARSKI ON 2/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$90.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 895990; Tender Amount: $90.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less