Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/06/2020 at 11:00:44 (UTC).

DELICIA SHULER Et Al VS DEXTER TAYLOR

Case Summary

On 01/23/2020 DELICIA SHULER filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against DEXTER TAYLOR. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********49AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioners

THE STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

DELICIA SHULER

Respondent

DEXTER TAYLOR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2020
  • Hearing03/24/2020 at 09:45AM - JACS-CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: HEARING ROOM #3 - 3RD FLOOR; Judge: DENTON, CHARLES;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM) - DELICIA LAVONNE SHULER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketESUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO DEXTER MAURICE TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO DEXTER MAURICE TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketPETITIONER'S MOTION FOR GENETIC TESTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO DELICIA LAVONNE SHULER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS JUDICIAL PROCEEDING TO DEXTER MAURICE TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketPATERNITY DECLARATION - DELICIA LAVONNE SHULER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketPATERNITY DECLARATION - DELICIA LAVONNE SHULER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO ESTABLISH PATERNITY, SUPPORT AND OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant