This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/15/2021 at 18:00:56 (UTC).

DEBORAH MORGENTHALER, JOSEPH SKWIRA Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 DEBORAH MORGENTHALER, JOSEPH SKWIRA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********11AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioners

RHONDA MCCARTHY

Bolingbrook, IL 60490

DEBORAH MORGENTHALER

Bolingbrook, IL 60490

Decedent

JOSEPH SKWIRA

Westchester, IL 60154

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DANIEL HOOPER SMITH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF EX PARTE HEARING - DATE: MONDAY, FEBRUARY 1, 2021 - TIME: 8:30 A.M. - MATTER: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF EX PARTE HEARING - DATE: MONDAY, FEBRUARY 1, 2021 - TIME: 8:30 A.M. - MATTER: ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVES, LETTERS OF ANCILLARY ADMINISTRATION AND PETITION TO APPOINT COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketFOREIGN PROBATE DOCUMENTS FROM COOK COUNTY, STATE OF ILLINOIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM DANIEL HOOPER SMITH, ESQ. - NOTICE OF FILING FOREIGN PROBATE DOCUMENTS FROM COOK COUNTY, ILLINOIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$400.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 886629; Tender Amount: $400.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF FOREIGN PROBATE FROM COOK COUNTY, ILLINOIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ANCILLARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT - DEBORAH MORGENTHALER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT - RHONDA MCCARTHY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NOFLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF DEATH - JOSEPH SKWIRA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANIEL HOOPER SMITH