This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 03/17/2022 at 05:38:14 (UTC).

DEBORAH M BLAKE, HANS HENRY OTTO SCHLIEBUS Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 DEBORAH M BLAKE, HANS HENRY OTTO SCHLIEBUS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********59AX

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DEBORAH M BLAKE

Decedent

HANS HENRY OTTO SCHLIEBUS

Sarasota, FL 34243

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ALVARO C SANCHEZ ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO AMENDED PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - EXHIBIT B - LEGAL DESCRIPTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO AMENDED PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - DEATH CERTIFICATE OF MARTHA D SCHLIEBUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$345.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 931752; Tender Amount: $345.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 931752

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 6/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION / EXHIBIT A - CERTIFICATION OF DEATH - MARTHA D SCHLIEBUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION / EXHIBIT B - PARCEL DESCRIPTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF DEATH - HANS HENRY OTTO SCHLIEBUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FL TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 6/19/2021 - id number 2249055

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00 AssessmentID 11717239

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCase 412021CP001959CPAXMA Filed with Clerk on 6/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANCHEZ, ALVARO C