This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/22/2021 at 18:01:41 (UTC).

DEBORAH DIANE PARRIS, PHILLIP KEITH PARRIS Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 DEBORAH DIANE PARRIS, PHILLIP KEITH PARRIS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********09AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DEBORAH DIANE PARRIS

Ellenton, FL 34222

Decedent

PHILLIP KEITH PARRIS

Ellenton, FL 34222

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JAMES DAVID JACKMAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF PHILLIP KEITH PARRIS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM - DATE: THURSDAY, FEBRUARY 4, 2021 - TIME: 8:30 A.M. - MATTER TO BE HEARD: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - THURSDAY, FEBRUARY 4, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF PHILLIP KEITH PARRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$345.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 886588; Tender Amount: $345.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PETITIONER, WAIVER OF NOTICE AND CONSENT TO PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - DEBORAH DIANE PARRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF DEATH - PHILLIP K PARRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES DAVID JACKMAN