This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/18/2020 at 14:07:43 (UTC).

DAVID HARMER Et Al VS JOANNE WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 DAVID HARMER filed an Other lawsuit against JOANNE WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD NICHOLAS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********35AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EDWARD NICHOLAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PHYLLIS HARMER

DAVID HARMER

ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

JOANNE WILLIAMS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TYLER DANIEL BROWN

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

07/16/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

04/09/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER - JOANNE WILLIAMS

02/20/2020 - ANSWER - JOANNE WILLIAMS

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED: JOANNE WILLIAMS - JANUARY 23 2020

01/22/2020 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED: JOANNE WILLIAMS - JANUARY 23 2020

COMPLAINT

01/22/2020 - COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES ON DEFENDANT JOANNE WILLIAMS

01/22/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES ON DEFENDANT JOANNE WILLIAMS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketST. JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FROM JOANNE WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION PURSUANT TO RULE 1.350, FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, DEFENDANT RESPONDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER - JOANNE WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$410.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797267; Tender Amount: $410.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT EXHIBIT A HOMEOWNERS POLICY DECLARATION / EXHIBIT B SUBROGATION ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED: JOANNE WILLIAMS - JANUARY 23 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO JOANNE WILLIAMS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES ON DEFENDANT JOANNE WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less