Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/26/2020 at 13:30:21 (UTC).

DANIEL ROMAN Et Al VS EQUITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 DANIEL ROMAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EQUITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT A FARRANCE and JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********27AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERT A FARRANCE

JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DANIEL ROMAN

HOPKINS CLINIC

Defendant

EQUITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILIP ANDREW MCCORMICK

Defendant Attorney

BENJAMIN WILLIAM SILVANIC

 

Court Documents

AGREED ORDER WAIVING PARTIES APPEARANCE AT PRE-TR1AL CONFERENCE. AND INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CML PROCEDURE

06/19/2020 - AGREED ORDER WAIVING PARTIES APPEARANCE AT PRE-TR1AL CONFERENCE. AND INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CML PROCEDURE

STIPULATION TO WAIVE ATTENDANCE AT THE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

06/17/2020 - STIPULATION TO WAIVE ATTENDANCE AT THE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES

06/01/2020 - NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO INVOKE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

03/18/2020 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO INVOKE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY BENJAMIN W. SILVANIC, ESQ OBO DEFENDANT, EQUITY INSURANCE COMPANY

03/18/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY BENJAMIN W. SILVANIC, ESQ OBO DEFENDANT, EQUITY INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS SERVED EQUITY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

02/18/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED EQUITY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO EQUITY INSURANCE COMPANY 2/4/2020

02/03/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO EQUITY INSURANCE COMPANY 2/4/2020

COMPLAINT

02/03/2020 - COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQ. OBO PLAINTIFF

02/03/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQ. OBO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

02/03/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/03/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER WAIVING PARTIES APPEARANCE AT PRE-TR1AL CONFERENCE. AND INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CML PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • Hearing06/18/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: HEARING HELD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF PRESENT, REPRESENTED BY PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT WAIVER OF APPEARANCE FILED MOTIONS TO BE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION TO WAIVE ATTENDANCE AT THE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE- RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • Hearing04/30/2020 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 6-18-2020 AT 9AM MAILED ALL PARTIES ON 4/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF NOTICE TO APPEAR- RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • Hearing03/23/2020 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY BENJAMIN W. SILVANIC, ESQ OBO DEFENDANT, EQUITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED EQUITY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$65.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 801279; Tender Amount: $65.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO EQUITY INSURANCE COMPANY 2/4/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQ. OBO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Equity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCORMICK PHILIP A