This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/23/2020 at 04:46:46 (UTC).

DANIEL L GULLING, NANCY E GULLING Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 DANIEL L GULLING, NANCY E GULLING was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENO G ECONOMOU. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********86AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENO G ECONOMOU

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Guardian Ad Litems

DANIEL L GULLING

Ranch, FL 34202

NANCY E GULLING

Ranch, FL 34202

Not Yet Classified

SCOTT M GULLING

Ranch, FL 34202

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Guardian Ad Litem Attorney

MELISSA ROGERT CASANUEVA

Not Yet Classified Attorney

REBECCA JUNE PROCTOR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketPROGRESS DOCKET ENTRY - NO PROPOSED ORDER APPROVING INITIAL PLAN PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketINITIAL GUARDIANSHIP PLAN (GUARDIANSHIP REPORT) OF GUARDIAN OF THE PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketORDER REQUIRING IMMEDIATE GUARDIAN ACTION - THE INITIAL PLAN DUE ON 4/12/2020 WITH PROPOSED ORDERS APPROVING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW - RE: SIERRA A. BUTLER ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL - SIERRA A. BUTLER ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketGUARDIANSHIP MONITOR REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketINITIAL GUARDIANSHIP REVIEW CHECKLIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketANNUAL GUARDIAN ADVOCATE REPORT ANNUAL GUARDIAN ADVOCATE PLAN OF GUARDIAN OF PERSON - FOR THE PERIOD OF 03/01/2019 TO 02/28/2020 (INCORRECT REPORT FILED - INITIAL PLAN IS THE REPORT THAT WILL BE DUE BY 4/12/2020 - ANNUAL PLAN NOT DUE UNTIL NEXT YEAR - AUDIT NOT NEEDED ON THIS REPORT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCONSENT TO MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL - DANIEL L. GULLING, CO-GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT AS GUARDIAN ADVOCATE - NANCY ELLEN GULLING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT AS STANDBY GUARDIAN ADVOCATE - KIRSTIN ANNE GULLING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT AS STANDBY GUARDIAN ADVOCATE - JOYCE A MOON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ORDER WAIVING GUARDIANSHIP EDUCATIONAL REQUIREMENT. INITIAL REPORT OF PROPERTY AND PERSON AND ANNUAL REPORT OF PROPERTY AND PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT - PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CO-GUARDIAN ADVOCATES AFTER CHANGE OF RESIDENCE AND APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR GUARDIANS - EXHIBIT A - FOREIGN GUARDIANSHIP - CERTIFIED COPY OF LETTERS OF GUARDIANSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketOATH OF GUARDIAN, DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketOATH OF GUARDIAN, DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT - PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CO-GUARDIAN ADVOCATES AFTER CHANGE OF RESIDENCE AND APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR GUARDIANS - EXHIBIT B - PHYSICIAN REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR EXEMPTION OF CO-GUARDIAN ADVOCATES FROM BACKGROUND INVESTIGATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CO-GUARDIAN ADVOCATES AFTER CHANGE OF RESIDENCE AND APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR GUARDIANS

    Read MoreRead Less