This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/03/2022 at 13:43:27 (UTC).

CRAIGER SCHEUER, LUIS ANTONIO BECKETT-MORALES Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/10/2022 CRAIGER SCHEUER, LUIS ANTONIO BECKETT-MORALES was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********66AX

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

 

Party Details

Appellants

LUIS ANTONIO BECKETT-MORALES

SHARON TALAMANTES-SANTIAGO

Appellee

CRAIGER SCHEUER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

DEREK WILLIAM EISEMANN

Appellee Attorney

DAVID JOSEPH FREDERICKS

 

Court Documents

RECORD ON APPEAL COMPLETED, SUBMITTED ELECTRONIC TO THE DISTRICT COURT AND COPY OF INDEX PROVIDED TO PARTIES

05/02/2022 - RECORD ON APPEAL COMPLETED, SUBMITTED ELECTRONIC TO THE DISTRICT COURT AND COPY OF INDEX PROVIDED TO PARTIES

SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD ON APPEAL COMPLETED, SUBMITTED ELECTRONIC TO THE DISTRICT COURT AND COPY OF INDEX PROVIDED TO PARTIES

06/13/2022 - SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD ON APPEAL COMPLETED, SUBMITTED ELECTRONIC TO THE DISTRICT COURT AND COPY OF INDEX PROVIDED TO PARTIES

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD ON APPEAL COMPLETED, SUBMITTED ELECTRONIC TO THE DISTRICT COURT AND COPY OF INDEX PROVIDED TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$164.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 1029688; Tender Amount: $164.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1029688

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $157.50 AssessmentID 11887676

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $7.00 AssessmentID 11887674

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORD ON APPEAL COMPLETED, SUBMITTED ELECTRONIC TO THE DISTRICT COURT AND COPY OF INDEX PROVIDED TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL TRANSMITTED TO THE DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $100.00 AssessmentID 11860600

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketCase 412022AP000066ACAXMA Filed with Clerk on 3/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EISEMANN, DEREK WILLIAM