Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/02/2020 at 13:01:24 (UTC).

COURTNEY PITCHER VS DANIEL PITCHER

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 COURTNEY PITCHER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DANIEL PITCHER. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********84AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COURTNEY PITCHER

Respondent

DANIEL PITCHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PETER JOHN MACKEY

Respondent Attorney

ANGELA DAVIS TOBAYGO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • Hearing01/23/2020 at 03:30PM - JACS-UNLISTED MOTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 3-E; Judge: MORELAND, DIANA L;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF EMAIL FROM ANGELA D. TOBAYGO, ESQ. TO GAIL ELLIOTT THURSDAY, JANUARY 23, 2020 RE: NO OBJECTIONS TO THE ENTRY OF THE PROPOSED ORDER SUBMITTED BY MR. MACKEY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY EXCLUSIVE USE AND POSSESSION OF MARITAL HOME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM PETER MACKEY, ESQ. TO JUDGE MOORELAND JAMMRY 22, 2020 RE: HEARING TOMORROW AT 3:30 P.M. CONCERNING COURTNEY PITCHER'S AMENDED MOTION FOR TEMPORARY EXCLUSIVE USE AND POSSESSION OF THE PARTIESRENTED HOUSE IN PALMETTO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ANGELA D. TOBAYGO, ESQ.ON BEHALF OF DANIEL PITCHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE AS TO DANIEL PITCHER SUMMONS SERVED 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED DANIEL PITCHER, JANUARY, 13 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO MOTION - COPY OF PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT'S WITH COPIES OF COURT DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketWIFE'S AMENDED MOTION FOR TEMPORARY EXCLUSIVE USE AND POSSESSION OF THE MARITAL HOME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketWIFE'S AMENDED MOTION FOR TEMPORARY EXCLUSIVE USE AND POSSESSION OF THE MARITAL HOME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - THURSDAY, JANUARY 23, 2020 AT 3:30 P.M. - REGARDING PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND WIFE'S MOTION FOR TERNPORARY EXCLUSIVE USE AND POSSESSION OF THE MARITAL HOME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$407.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 794012; Tender Amount: $407.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketWIFE'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY EXCLUSIVE USE AND POSSESSION OF THE MARITAL HOME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO : DANIEL PITCHER 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANGELA DAVIS TOBAYGO