This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 03/02/2021 at 23:05:11 (UTC).

COLE MOORE VS CHEVRON GAS STATION

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 COLE MOORE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CHEVRON GAS STATION. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********26AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLE MOORE

Defendant

CHEVRON GAS STATION

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS SERVED CHEVRON GAS STATION 1/26/2021

02/01/2021 - SUMMONS SERVED CHEVRON GAS STATION 1/26/2021

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/22/2021 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • Hearing03/01/2021 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: HEARING HELD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF COLE MOORE, PRESENT - PRO SE DEFENDANT CHEVRON GAS STATION - RICARDO LEAL, PRESENT SERVED DENY CLAIM SET FOR MEDIATION ON 4/5/2021 AT 2:00 PM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED CHEVRON GAS STATION 1/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$185.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 886466; Tender Amount: $185.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO CHEVRON GAS STATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED HANDED TO PLANTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less