Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/04/2020 at 01:14:15 (UTC).

CHRISTIAN GARDNER Et Al VS USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 CHRISTIAN GARDNER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********00AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHRISTIAN GARDNER

GARDNER CLINIC

Defendant

USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILIP ANDREW MCCORMICK

Defendant Attorney

STEPHEN G MELLOR

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO ENFORCE COURT ORDER AND FOR SANCTIONS

07/16/2020 - MOTION TO ENFORCE COURT ORDER AND FOR SANCTIONS

AGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS

07/02/2020 - AGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS

DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG

06/26/2020 - DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG

NOTICE OF PRE-TR1AL CONFERENCE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

06/22/2020 - NOTICE OF PRE-TR1AL CONFERENCE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

AGREED ORDER ON STIPULATION

05/01/2020 - AGREED ORDER ON STIPULATION

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/24/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

04/24/2020 - MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

DEFENDANT, NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/24/2020 - DEFENDANT, NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/23/2020 - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

04/23/2020 - STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY STEPHEN G. MELLOR, ESQ. OBO DEFENDANT,

04/23/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY STEPHEN G. MELLOR, ESQ. OBO DEFENDANT,

SUMMONS SERVED USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

02/18/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

COMPLAINT

02/03/2020 - COMPLAINT

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, 2/4/2020

02/03/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, 2/4/2020

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

02/03/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/03/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/03/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF AGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS ATTACHED TO MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO ENFORCE COURT ORDER AND FOR SANCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING OFFER OF JUDGMENT/PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • Hearing07/02/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketRESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRE-TR1AL CONFERENCE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • Hearing05/07/2020 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE PER COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$65.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 800955; Tender Amount: $65.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, 2/4/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCORMICK PHILIP A