This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 01/15/2023 at 21:07:11 (UTC).

CHARLES R WELLS Et Al VS DALTON T NELSON

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 CHARLES R WELLS filed a Probate - Mental Health lawsuit against DALTON T NELSON. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********60AX

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Mental Health

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE

DET CHRISTOPHER SCHMITT

CHARLES R WELLS

Respondent

DALTON T NELSON

Bradenton, FL 34211

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRIAN A ITEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCompliance EVIDENCE RETENTION has been created with due date of 3/13/2023 - id number 2464906

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • Hearing12/07/2022 at 11:00AM - JACS-FINAL HEARING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 5-D; Judge: MORELAND, DIANA L; Result: CANCELLED-JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketPETITIONER EXHIBIT - COPY OF BRADENTON POLICE DEPARTMENT WITNESS / VICTIM STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketDOCUMENT OR ITEM NOT SCANNABLE - BLACK FLASH DRIVE ATTACHED TO TAG MARKED AND RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • Hearing11/30/2022 at 09:30AM - JACS-OTHER MOTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 5-D; Judge: MORELAND, DIANA L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE AND CONSUMER SERVICES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY EX PARTE RISK PROTECTION & ORDER ON 3 DAY COMPLIANCE HEARING AND SETTING FINAL HEARING - RETURNED - SERVED ON DALTON TYLER NELSON ON 11/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCompliance RPO-EXPIRE has been created with due date of 10/16/2023 - id number 2460379

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketFINAL ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR RISK PROTECTION - FILED IN OPEN COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING RISK PROTECTION ORDER RIREARM/AMMOUNITION SEIZURE RECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY EX PARTE RISK PROTECTION AND ORDER ON 3 DAY COMPLIANCE HEARING AND SETTING FINAL HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE AND CONSUMER SERVICES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketREPORT OF CLERKS SEARCH OF COURT RECORDS FOR RESPONDENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY EX PARTE RISK PROTECTION AND ORDER ON 3 DAY COMPLIANCE HEARING AND SETTING FINAL HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO PETITION FOR RISK PROTECTION ORDER - MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE AFFIDAVIT - MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE RISK PROTECTION ORDER FIREARM/AMMUNITION SEIZURE RECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR TEMPORARY EX PARTE RISK PROTECTION ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCase 412022MH003760MHAXMA Filed with Clerk on 11/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MANATEE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE is a litigant