Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/31/2020 at 14:36:03 (UTC).

CHARLENE RAWLINGS Et Al VS ACCEPTANCE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 CHARLENE RAWLINGS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ACCEPTANCE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********19AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GAINESVILLE HIGH FIELD MRI CENTER INC

CHARLENE RAWLINGS

Defendant

ACCEPTANCE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILIP ANDREW MCCORMICK

Defendant Attorney

KRISTAN SMITH COAD

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

06/10/2020 - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND JURY TRIAL DEMAND

05/13/2020 - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND JURY TRIAL DEMAND

JOINT STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

05/05/2020 - JOINT STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

04/08/2020 - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES IN COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 KRISTAN SMITH COAD, ESQUIRE OBO ACCEPTANCE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

04/08/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES IN COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 KRISTAN SMITH COAD, ESQUIRE OBO ACCEPTANCE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS SERVED ACCEPTANCE INDEMMTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

02/18/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED ACCEPTANCE INDEMMTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ACCEPTANCE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, 2/4/2020

02/03/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ACCEPTANCE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, 2/4/2020

COMPLAINT

02/03/2020 - COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/03/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

02/03/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/03/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • Hearing07/02/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE MOTIONS TO BE FILED VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND JURY TRIAL DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • Hearing05/07/2020 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE PER COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE PER COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED ACCEPTANCE INDEMMTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$65.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 801198; Tender Amount: $65.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ACCEPTANCE INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, 2/4/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Acceptance Indemnity Insurance Company, is a litigant

Latest cases where GAINESVILLE HIGH FIELD MRI CENTER INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRISTAN SMITH COAD