This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 05/21/2022 at 23:20:45 (UTC).

CHAMBERS MEDICAL GROUP INC Et Al VS OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 CHAMBERS MEDICAL GROUP INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********55AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHAMBERS MEDICAL GROUP INC

JOSEPH MCGAHAN

Defendant

OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHONY D BARAK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketUpdated Event PTC on 2/14/2022 0100 PM Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS results CONTINUED on 2/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • Hearing02/14/2022 at 01:00PM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF-REPRESENTED BY BRIAN CRIM DEFENDANT-NOT PRESENT CONTINUED FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$0.00; Total Voided Amount:($185.00); Receipt Number: 991121; Tender Amount: $185.00; Voided Amount: ($185.00); Voided: Voided;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 991121

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 1/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketEvent PTC scheduled on 2/14/2022 at 0100 PM, JC - Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS presiding. EventID 1392870

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 1/13/2022 - id number 2331143

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00 AssessmentID 11827392

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCase 412022SC000255SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 1/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHAMBERS MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where Ohio Security Insuance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARAK, ANTHONY