Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/02/2020 at 06:33:30 (UTC).

CENTRAL IMAGING OPEN MRI INC Et Al VS ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 CENTRAL IMAGING OPEN MRI INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********06AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CENTRAL IMAGING OPEN MRI INC

KATHERINE SLATTERY

Defendant

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILIP ANDREW MCCORMICK

Defendant Attorney

ANTHONY JOSEPH PARRINO

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

06/22/2020 - NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

ORDER WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

06/17/2020 - ORDER WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

ORDER WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

04/29/2020 - ORDER WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/28/2020 - DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

STIPULATION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

04/13/2020 - STIPULATION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

ORDER WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

03/26/2020 - ORDER WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES BY ANTHONY J. PARRINO, ESQUIRE OBO DEFENDANT, ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

03/18/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES BY ANTHONY J. PARRINO, ESQUIRE OBO DEFENDANT, ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

STIPULATION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

03/18/2020 - STIPULATION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

SUMMONS SERVED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

02/18/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

COMPLAINT

02/03/2020 - COMPLAINT

ESUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY 2/4/2020

02/03/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY 2/4/2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/03/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

02/03/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/03/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • Hearing07/02/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • Hearing05/07/2020 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE PER COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$65.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 800990; Tender Amount: $65.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY 2/4/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTRAL IMAGING OPEN MRI INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANTHONY J PARRINO