This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 12/04/2022 at 20:13:54 (UTC).

CENTEX HOMES, DIVOSTA HOMES L P Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 CENTEX HOMES, DIVOSTA HOMES L P was filed as a Contract - Insurance lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD NICHOLAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********99AX

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EDWARD NICHOLAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC

CENTEX HOMES

DIVOSTA HOMES L P

Defendants

DEXTER BENJAMIN

DONNA BENJAMIN

NICHOLAS A PRUITT

JENNIFER L YANTZ

JOSEPH L RANDALL JR

URSLER WILLIAMS RANDALL

ANTHONY ROMANO

LINDA ROMANO

BRAD MCDONALD ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION INC

BUILDERS FIRSTSOURCE FLORIDA

ESTERLINE FRAMING COMPANY INC

GARCIA CONCRETE AND LAYOUT INC

MARIOS PAINTING OF SOUTH FLORIDA INC

BFS GROUP LLC

SITELINE BUILDING SOLUTIONS LLC

SKYLINE BUILDING AND CONSTRUCTION GROUP

SOUTH SHORE PAINTING AND WATERPROOFING LLC

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLEN GERMUSKA SMITH

Defendant Attorneys

NEIL PATRICK O'BRIEN

SHANNON L MARIBONA

JONATHAN NEIL ZAIFERT

Other Attorneys

ROBIN PETRONELLA KEENER

SINA BAHADORAN

KIMBERLY NANICE RAMEY

JORGE A MAZA

LAUREN S CURTIS

STACY M EMAS

GINGER BARRY BOYD

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT, SOIC INSURANCE COMPANY'S, ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/29/2022 - DEFENDANT, SOIC INSURANCE COMPANY'S, ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEFENDANT AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND MOTION TO STRIKE

11/28/2022 - DEFENDANT AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND MOTION TO STRIKE

AMENDED NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY - VALERIE M. JACKSON

11/17/2022 - AMENDED NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY - VALERIE M. JACKSON

DEFENDANT LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND COMPEL SEPARATE STATEMENTS

11/17/2022 - DEFENDANT LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND COMPEL SEPARATE STATEMENTS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY EMAIL ADDRESSES - GINGER BARRY BOYD OBO LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

11/17/2022 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY EMAIL ADDRESSES - GINGER BARRY BOYD OBO LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/08/2022 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

11/08/2022 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

SUMMONS SERVED SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, INC., 11/3/2022 WITH ATTACHED COPY OF COMPLAINT

11/07/2022 - SUMMONS SERVED SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, INC., 11/3/2022 WITH ATTACHED COPY OF COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT KINSALE INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

11/04/2022 - DEFENDANT KINSALE INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT NATIONAL BUILDERS INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

11/03/2022 - DEFENDANT NATIONAL BUILDERS INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/03/2022 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CIRCUIT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING - JANUARY 24, 2023 AT 9:00 AM

11/03/2022 - CIRCUIT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING - JANUARY 24, 2023 AT 9:00 AM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES KIMBERLY N. RAMEY, ESQ. OBO AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY.

10/27/2022 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES KIMBERLY N. RAMEY, ESQ. OBO AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY.

SUMMONS SERVED VIMAR STUCCO INC 10/3/2022

10/26/2022 - SUMMONS SERVED VIMAR STUCCO INC 10/3/2022

SUMMONS SERVED SOUTH SHORE PAINTING AND WATERPROOFING LLC 10/3/2022

10/26/2022 - SUMMONS SERVED SOUTH SHORE PAINTING AND WATERPROOFING LLC 10/3/2022

SUMMONS SERVED SITELINE BUILDING SOLUTIONS LLC 10/13/2022

10/26/2022 - SUMMONS SERVED SITELINE BUILDING SOLUTIONS LLC 10/13/2022

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/26/2022 - COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS SERVED MARIOS PAINTING OF SOUTH FLORIDA INC 9/29/2022

10/26/2022 - SUMMONS SERVED MARIOS PAINTING OF SOUTH FLORIDA INC 9/29/2022

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2023
  • Hearing01/24/2023 at 09:00AM - CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: NICHOLAS, EDWARD;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT, SOIC INSURANCE COMPANY'S, ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND MOTION TO STRIKE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY - VALERIE M. JACKSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND COMPEL SEPARATE STATEMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY EMAIL ADDRESSES - GINGER BARRY BOYD OBO LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 10/5/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFE'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFE'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, CLEAR BLUE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT DEXTER BENJAMIN / DONNA BENJAMIN / NICHOLAS A. PRUITT/ JENNIFER L YANTS / JOSEPH L. RANDALL/ URSLER WILLIAMS-RANDALL / ANTHONY ROMANO/ LINDA ROMANO/ BRAD MCDONALD ROOFING & CONSTRUCTION, INC./ BUILDERS FIRSTSOURCE FLORIDA, LLC/ ESTERLINE FRAMING COMPANY INC/ GARCIA CONCRETE & LAYOUT, INC / MARIO'S PAINTING OF SOUTH FLORIDA, INC/ BFS GROUP LLC F/K/A PROBUILD COMPANY, LLC/ SITELINE BUILDING SOLUTIONS, LLC/ SKYLINE BUILDING & CONSTRUCTION CORP/ SOUTH SHORE PAINTING AND WATERPROOFING LLC/ SUTTON CONTRACTING SOLUTIONS, INC./ VIMAR STUCCO INC./ AXIS SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY/ BERKLEY ASSURANCE CO / CLEAR BLUE SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO / ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO Y/ EVANSTON INSURANCE CO / FIRST MERCURY INSURANCE CO Y/ INDIAN HARBOR INSURANCE CO/ KINSALE INSURANCE CO Y/ KNIGHT SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY/ LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE CO / NATIONAL BUILDERS INSURANCE CO / REPUBLIC-VANGUARD INSURANCE CO / SOUTHERNOWNERS INSURANCE CO /STARR INDEMINTY & LIABILITY CO /STARR SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE CO / UNITED SPECIALITY INSURANCE CO -ISSUED -- SEPTEMBER 23 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT 1 - INDENTIFICATION CHART / 2- IS A CHART WHICH IDENTIFIES VARIOUS INSURANCE POLICIES ISSUED BY THE RESPECTIVE INSURERS TO THE RESPECTIVE TRADES OR THE "POLICIES" / 3- THE AGREEMENT DOCUMENTS BETWEEN PULTE AND BRAD MCDONALD/ 4 -13 THE AGREEMENT DOCUMENTS BETWEEN PULTE AND BFS RELATING TO THE PROJECTS/

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 9/16/2022 - id number 2432771

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11965183

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCase 412022CA003899CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 9/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SKYLINE BUILDING AND CONSTRUCTION GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where ESTERLINE FRAMING COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where GCL, LLC is a litigant