Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 03/21/2021 at 23:06:14 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS MARCELLU D DUNBAR

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARCELLU D DUNBAR. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********71AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

MARCELLU D DUNBAR

Palmetto, FL 34221-9013

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DERYL G HUNT JR

 

Court Documents

SUMMOSN SERVED MARCELLU D DUNBAR 3/09/2021

03/10/2021 - SUMMOSN SERVED MARCELLU D DUNBAR 3/09/2021

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO MARCELLU D DUNBAR ON 3/4/2021

02/25/2021 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO MARCELLU D DUNBAR ON 3/4/2021

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/25/2021 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/25/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • Hearing04/05/2021 at 11:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMOSN SERVED MARCELLU D DUNBAR 3/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$310.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 896429; Tender Amount: $310.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketBILL OF SALE ASSIGNMENT / ACCOUNT STATEMENT ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO MARCELLU D DUNBAR ON 3/4/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNT , DERYL G