This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/03/2020 at 13:31:14 (UTC).

CATHERINE CHEAVES VS DELORIS CARNES Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2020 CATHERINE CHEAVES filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against DELORIS CARNES. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK D SINGER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********56AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARK D SINGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CATHERINE CHEAVES

Defendants

EDWARD LEE BANKS JR

DELORIS CARNES

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

03/12/2020 - WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

02/26/2020 - FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

SUMMONS SERVED DELORIS CARNES 2/5/2020

02/24/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED DELORIS CARNES 2/5/2020

SUMMONS SERVED EDWARD LEE BANKS JR 2/5/2020

02/24/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED EDWARD LEE BANKS JR 2/5/2020

ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PENDING EVICTION ON MONDAY, FEBRUARY 24, 2020 AT 2:30 P.M.

02/12/2020 - ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PENDING EVICTION ON MONDAY, FEBRUARY 24, 2020 AT 2:30 P.M.

LETTER TO JUDGE - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

02/10/2020 - LETTER TO JUDGE - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/04/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

02/04/2020 - COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

02/04/2020 - CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/04/2020 - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 02/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED- CONTACTED PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketLETTER TO JUDGE RETURNED FROM JUDGE- NO ACTION BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Hearing02/24/2020 at 02:30PM - JACS-UNLISTED MOTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-C; Judge: SINGER, MARK D;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED DELORIS CARNES 2/5/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED EDWARD LEE BANKS JR 2/5/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING ON PENDING EVICTION ON MONDAY, FEBRUARY 24, 2020 AT 2:30 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO JUDGE - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO DELORIS CARNES/EDWARD LEE BANKS JR 2/4/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF TERMINATION OF TENANCY ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCONSENT TO CASE CLOSURE AFTER 90 DAYS OF INACTIVITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less