This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 09/13/2023 at 01:02:04 (UTC).

JANINE J MAY, RICHARD S YARB Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/30/2023 JANINE J MAY, RICHARD S YARB was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********93AX

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JANINE J MAY

Decedent

RICHARD S YARB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

EDWARD WILLIAM SOULSBY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2023
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $348.50; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1153171; Tender Amount: $345.00; Receipt Number: 1161812; Tender Amount: $3.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - AT&T MOBILITY - MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK REGARDING STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1161812

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $3.50 AssessmentID 12116284

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION / NOTICE TO CREDITORS - 06/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF NOTICE - VETERANS ADMINISTRATION - VOLUNTARY SERVICES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF NOTICE - TITUS HERMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF NOTICE - SHELLY THAYER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF NOTICE - MELISSA YARB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1153171

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 5/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE - JANINE MAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH - RICHARD YARB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 5/31/2023 - id number 2527184

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00 AssessmentID 12101685

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketCase 412023CP001893CPAXMA Filed with Clerk on 5/30/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less