This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 10/12/2023 at 03:04:19 (UTC).

LAKEWOOD RANCH CHIROPRACTIC INC VS SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/03/2023 LAKEWOOD RANCH CHIROPRACTIC INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********83AX

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKEWOOD RANCH CHIROPRACTIC INC

Defendant

SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN CHRISTOPHER DALY

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAM JOHN MCFARLANE III

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED COPY OF COURT PROGRESS DOCKET

08/03/2023 - CERTIFIED COPY OF COURT PROGRESS DOCKET

DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - TRANSFER CASE

08/03/2023 - DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - TRANSFER CASE

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT IN RELATION TO COUNT | OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION

08/18/2023 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT IN RELATION TO COUNT | OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR IMPROPER VENUE - TRANSFER CASE

08/03/2023 - DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR IMPROPER VENUE - TRANSFER CASE

PLAINTIFFS EXPERT REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - TRANSFER CASE

08/03/2023 - PLAINTIFFS EXPERT REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - TRANSFER CASE

DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - TRANSFER CASE

08/03/2023 - DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - TRANSFER CASE

DEFENDANTS PRIVILEGE LOG - TRANSFER CASE

08/03/2023 - DEFENDANTS PRIVILEGE LOG - TRANSFER CASE

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF FILING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES REGARDING EXPERTS - TRANSFER CASE

08/03/2023 - DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF FILING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES REGARDING EXPERTS - TRANSFER CASE

DEFENDANTS FACT WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST - TRANSFER CASE

08/03/2023 - DEFENDANTS FACT WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST - TRANSFER CASE

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT IN RELATION TO COUNT | OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023

FinancialTotal Receipts: 1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $55.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1174764; Tender Amount: $55.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFENDANTS FACT WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST - TRANSFER CASE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFFS WITNESS LIST EXPERT WITNESS LIST AND EXHIBIT LIST - TRANSFER CASE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketUNIFORM CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND RELATED REQUIREMENTS- TRANSFER CASE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPLAINTIFFS EXPERT REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - TRANSFER CASE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - TRANSFER CASE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT - TRANSFER CASE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - TRANSFER CASE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - TRANSFER CASE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - TRANSFER CASE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDEFENDANTS NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR IMPROPER VENUE - TRANSFER CASE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOPY OF RECEIPT FOR FILE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR IMPROPER VENUE AND/OR DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF COURT PROGRESS DOCKET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023

DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1174764

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023

DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 8/3/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023

DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 8/4/2023 - id number 2553691

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $55.00 AssessmentID 12138604

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023

DocketCase 412023SC004483SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 8/3/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less