This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 03/30/2023 at 13:01:58 (UTC).

ANTONIO DIMCHEVSKI VS MARIA NIKIA CHALKIAS

Case Summary

On 03/06/2023 ANTONIO DIMCHEVSKI filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MARIA NIKIA CHALKIAS. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEVIN BRUNING. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********69AX

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEVIN BRUNING

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ANTONIO DIMCHEVSKI

Respondent

MARIA NIKIA CHALKIAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROBERT J HOFFMAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (UNCONTESTED) RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS ON 03/27/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketLETTER FROM ROBERT HOFFMAN TO JUDGE BREWER REGARDING FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketFAMILY COURT SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES CHECKLIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketDIVISIONS 3 & 4: SPECIAL INTEROGATORIES FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $397.50; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1122456; Tender Amount: $397.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO RELATED CASE FOR JUDGE ASSIGNMENT / TRANSFER TO THE UNIFIED FAMILY COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (LONG FORM) -RESPONDENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT -PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketANSWER, WAIVER, AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1122456

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 3/7/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketPETITIONER'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 3/7/2023 - id number 2493849

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $397.50 AssessmentID 12050497

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCase 412023DR000969DRAXMA Filed with Clerk on 3/6/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less