This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 09/21/2023 at 06:02:51 (UTC).

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL SERVICES VS FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC

Case Summary

On 05/04/2023 FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL SERVICES filed an Other lawsuit against FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********83AX

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL SERVICES

Defendant

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TYLER DANIEL BROWN

Defendant Attorney

DAVID A MERCER

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION

08/21/2023 - MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES

06/22/2023 - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES

ORDER AMENDING PLEADINGS BY INTERLINEATION

05/31/2023 - ORDER AMENDING PLEADINGS BY INTERLINEATION

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

05/30/2023 - ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

05/08/2023 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/04/2023 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

RETURN OF SERVICE TO FRONTIER COMMNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC. C/O CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY SERVED 5/9/2023

05/09/2023 - RETURN OF SERVICE TO FRONTIER COMMNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC. C/O CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY SERVED 5/9/2023

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC.

05/08/2023 - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 5/5/2023 AS TO DEFENDANT FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC.

05/04/2023 - SUMMONS ISSUED ON 5/5/2023 AS TO DEFENDANT FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC.

MOTION TO COMPEL SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY RESPONSES INCLUDING INSPECTION REPORTS, PHOTOGRAPHS AND VIDEOS WITH EXHIBITS A- INTERROGATORIES / REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION / LETTERS FROM BUTLER WEIHMULLER/ ST. JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. 'S RESPONSE TO INTER

09/13/2023 - MOTION TO COMPEL SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY RESPONSES INCLUDING INSPECTION REPORTS, PHOTOGRAPHS AND VIDEOS WITH EXHIBITS A- INTERROGATORIES / REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION / LETTERS FROM BUTLER WEIHMULLER/ ST. JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. 'S RESPONSE TO INTERROGATORIES/ PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION /

NOTICE OF HEARING/ 10/30/2023 9 AM VIA ZOOM

09/01/2023 - NOTICE OF HEARING/ 10/30/2023 9 AM VIA ZOOM

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

08/31/2023 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

LOG IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION CASE NO.: 2023-CA-003483 DEFENDANT, FRONTIER FLORIDA, LLC'S,

08/31/2023 - LOG IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION CASE NO.: 2023-CA-003483 DEFENDANT, FRONTIER FLORIDA, LLC'S,

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO CIVIL MAGISTRATE

08/25/2023 - ORDER OF REFERRAL TO CIVIL MAGISTRATE

MOTION TO COMPEL INSPECTION REPORTS AND PHOTOGRAPHS

08/22/2023 - MOTION TO COMPEL INSPECTION REPORTS AND PHOTOGRAPHS

PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/25/2023 - PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES

07/25/2023 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/22/2023 - DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2023
  • Hearing10/30/2023 at 09:00AM - JACS-COMPEL; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: CASKEY, DAVID P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY RESPONSES INCLUDING INSPECTION REPORTS, PHOTOGRAPHS AND VIDEOS WITH EXHIBITS A- INTERROGATORIES / REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION / LETTERS FROM BUTLER WEIHMULLER/ ST. JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. 'S RESPONSE TO INTERROGATORIES/ PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION /

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING/ 10/30/2023 9 AM VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLOG IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION CASE NO.: 2023-CA-003483 DEFENDANT, FRONTIER FLORIDA, LLC'S,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO CIVIL MAGISTRATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL INSPECTION REPORTS AND PHOTOGRAPHS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXEMPTION FROM FILING FEES PURSUANT TO FLA STAT 631.231

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON 5/5/2023 AS TO DEFENDANT FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT /EXHIBIT A FULL COPY OF THE POLICY IS AVAILABLE UPON REQUEST/ EXHIBIB B - COPY OF THE ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 5/4/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 5/5/2023 - id number 2517890

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 12087425

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketCase 412023CA003483CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 5/4/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less