This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 10/31/2023 at 13:30:41 (UTC).

THE FLORIDA LP VS ADAM SMITH Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2023 THE FLORIDA LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ADAM SMITH. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********56AX

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE FLORIDA LP

Defendants

LEAANNE BERNSTEIN

ADAM SMITH

ANA MARIA SMITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW EDWARD SIEGEL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/01/2023 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

09/01/2023 - COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A: RENEWAL RENTAL AGREEMENT

09/01/2023 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A: RENEWAL RENTAL AGREEMENT

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT B: THREE DAY NOTICE TO PAY RENT OR DELIVER POSSESSION

09/01/2023 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT B: THREE DAY NOTICE TO PAY RENT OR DELIVER POSSESSION

EVICTION SUMMONS/RESIDENTIAL ISSUED ON 9/6/2023 AS TO ANA MARIA SMITH

09/01/2023 - EVICTION SUMMONS/RESIDENTIAL ISSUED ON 9/6/2023 AS TO ANA MARIA SMITH

EVICTION SUMMONS/RESIDENTIAL ISSUED ON 9/6/2023 AS TO ADAM SMITH

09/01/2023 - EVICTION SUMMONS/RESIDENTIAL ISSUED ON 9/6/2023 AS TO ADAM SMITH

EVICTION SUMMONS/RESIDENTIAL ISSUED ON 9/6/2023 AS TO LEAANNE BERNSTEIN

09/01/2023 - EVICTION SUMMONS/RESIDENTIAL ISSUED ON 9/6/2023 AS TO LEAANNE BERNSTEIN

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

09/21/2023 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

10/05/2023 - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

 

Docket Entries

10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

FinancialTotal Receipts: 1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $215.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1184702; Tender Amount: $215.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1184702

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 9/5/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEVICTION SUMMONS/RESIDENTIAL ISSUED ON 9/6/2023 AS TO LEAANNE BERNSTEIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEVICTION SUMMONS/RESIDENTIAL ISSUED ON 9/6/2023 AS TO ADAM SMITH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEVICTION SUMMONS/RESIDENTIAL ISSUED ON 9/6/2023 AS TO ANA MARIA SMITH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT B: THREE DAY NOTICE TO PAY RENT OR DELIVER POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A: RENEWAL RENTAL AGREEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023

DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 9/2/2023 - id number 2566426

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00 AssessmentID 12155221

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023

DocketCase 412023CC005156CCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 9/1/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less