This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/27/2023 at 13:30:42 (UTC).

ROCKET MORTGAGE LLC VS JAMES E MCCLAIN JR Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/28/2023 ROCKET MORTGAGE LLC filed an Other lawsuit against JAMES E MCCLAIN JR. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********09AX

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROCKET MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

JAMES E MCCLAIN JR

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

LANGDON HALL LAND LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JASON MICHAEL VANSLETTE

Defendant Attorney

JOHN FORNEY RUDY III

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/28/2023 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

VERIFIED COMPLAINT

04/28/2023 - VERIFIED COMPLAINT

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A - COPY OF THE NOTE / EXHIBIT B - COPY OF THE MORTGAGE

04/28/2023 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A - COPY OF THE NOTE / EXHIBIT B - COPY OF THE MORTGAGE

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

04/28/2023 - VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-17.1

04/28/2023 - ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-17.1

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT JAMES E. MCCLAIN, JR/ UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAMES E. MCCLAIN, JR/ UNKNOWN TENANT #1/ UNKNOWN TENANT #2/ UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT/ LANGDON HALL LAND, LLC -- ISSUED 5/1/20

04/28/2023 - SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT JAMES E. MCCLAIN, JR/ UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAMES E. MCCLAIN, JR/ UNKNOWN TENANT #1/ UNKNOWN TENANT #2/ UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT/ LANGDON HALL LAND, LLC -- ISSUED 5/1/2023

CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 702.015(4)

04/28/2023 - CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 702.015(4)

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

04/28/2023 - NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

05/04/2023 - CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

SUMMONS SERVED UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT MAY, 2 2023

05/10/2023 - SUMMONS SERVED UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT MAY, 2 2023

SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #2,

05/17/2023 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #2,

SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #1

05/17/2023 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #1

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

06/14/2023 - FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

SUMMONS SERVED JAMES E. MCCLAIN JR. JUNE 9 2023

06/14/2023 - SUMMONS SERVED JAMES E. MCCLAIN JR. JUNE 9 2023

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

06/14/2023 - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTEMPTED SERVICE - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAMES E. MCCLAIN, JR RETURNED SERVED JUNE 9 2023

06/21/2023 - AFFIDAVIT OF ATTEMPTED SERVICE - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAMES E. MCCLAIN, JR RETURNED SERVED JUNE 9 2023

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF ATTEMPTED SERVICE - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAMES E. MCCLAIN, JR RETURNED SERVED JUNE 9 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 3 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $1,009.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1143212; Tender Amount: $981.50; Receipt Number: 1158074; Tender Amount: $18.50; Receipt Number: 1158313; Tender Amount: $9.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1158313

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $9.00 AssessmentID 12110699

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 3 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $1,009.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1143212; Tender Amount: $981.50; Receipt Number: 1158074; Tender Amount: $18.50; Receipt Number: 1158313; Tender Amount: $9.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED JAMES E. MCCLAIN JR. JUNE 9 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1158074

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $18.50 AssessmentID 12110232

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 702.015(4)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT JAMES E. MCCLAIN, JR/ UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAMES E. MCCLAIN, JR/ UNKNOWN TENANT #1/ UNKNOWN TENANT #2/ UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT/ LANGDON HALL LAND, LLC -- ISSUED 5/1/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-17.1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A - COPY OF THE NOTE / EXHIBIT B - COPY OF THE MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 4/29/2023 - id number 2515931

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $905.00 AssessmentID 12084514

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketCase 412023CA003409CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 4/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less