This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/07/2023 at 13:33:08 (UTC).

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST VS WHITE DIAMOND LANDSCAPE INC

Case Summary

On 05/08/2023 INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST filed an Other lawsuit against WHITE DIAMOND LANDSCAPE INC. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********24AX

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST

Defendant

WHITE DIAMOND LANDSCAPE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT CRAIG GRAHAM JR

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/08/2023 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

05/08/2023 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT- COMPOSITE EXHIBIT A WORKERS' COMPENSATION INSURANCE IMPORTANT NOTICE TO POLICYHOLDER / WAIVER OF OUR RIGHT TO RECOVER FROM OTHERS ENDORSEMENT

05/08/2023 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT- COMPOSITE EXHIBIT A WORKERS' COMPENSATION INSURANCE IMPORTANT NOTICE TO POLICYHOLDER / WAIVER OF OUR RIGHT TO RECOVER FROM OTHERS ENDORSEMENT

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED- WHITE DIAMOND LANDSCAPE, INC. 5/18/2023

05/08/2023 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED- WHITE DIAMOND LANDSCAPE, INC. 5/18/2023

COPY OF STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY COURT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

05/08/2023 - COPY OF STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY COURT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $410.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1149276; Tender Amount: $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1149276

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 5/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY COURT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED- WHITE DIAMOND LANDSCAPE, INC. 5/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT- COMPOSITE EXHIBIT A WORKERS' COMPENSATION INSURANCE IMPORTANT NOTICE TO POLICYHOLDER / WAIVER OF OUR RIGHT TO RECOVER FROM OTHERS ENDORSEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 5/9/2023 - id number 2522822

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 12095074

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketCase 412023CC002924CCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 5/8/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less