This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 09/14/2023 at 08:00:30 (UTC).

ROCKET MORTGAGE LLC VS GEOFFREY M FRANTZ Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/07/2023 ROCKET MORTGAGE LLC filed an Other lawsuit against GEOFFREY M FRANTZ. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********60AX

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROCKET MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

GEOFFREY M FRANTZ

KELLY C FRANTZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KELLEY LOUISE CHURCH

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/07/2023 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

VERIFIED COMPLAINT

09/07/2023 - VERIFIED COMPLAINT

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A -E-NOTE CERTIFICATE OF AUTHENTICATION/ NOTE/ MORTGAGE / ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE/ NOTICE OF DEFAULT

09/07/2023 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A -E-NOTE CERTIFICATE OF AUTHENTICATION/ NOTE/ MORTGAGE / ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE/ NOTICE OF DEFAULT

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

09/07/2023 - VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021 - 6.1

09/07/2023 - ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021 - 6.1

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 9/8/2023 AS TO DEFENDANT GEOFFREY M FRANTZ A/K/A GEOFFREY MCKENZIE FRANTZ/ KELLY C FRANTZ A/K/A KELLY CHRISTINE FRANTZ/ UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GEOFFREY M FRANTZ A/K/A GEOFFREY MCKENZIE FRANTZ/ UNKNOWN TENANT 1/ UNKNOWN TENANT 2/

09/07/2023 - SUMMONS ISSUED ON 9/8/2023 AS TO DEFENDANT GEOFFREY M FRANTZ A/K/A GEOFFREY MCKENZIE FRANTZ/ KELLY C FRANTZ A/K/A KELLY CHRISTINE FRANTZ/ UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GEOFFREY M FRANTZ A/K/A GEOFFREY MCKENZIE FRANTZ/ UNKNOWN TENANT 1/ UNKNOWN TENANT 2/

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

09/07/2023 - NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

 

Docket Entries

09/08/2023

FinancialTotal Receipts: 1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $1,966.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1185717; Tender Amount: $1,966.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1185717

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 9/8/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON 9/8/2023 AS TO DEFENDANT GEOFFREY M FRANTZ A/K/A GEOFFREY MCKENZIE FRANTZ/ KELLY C FRANTZ A/K/A KELLY CHRISTINE FRANTZ/ UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GEOFFREY M FRANTZ A/K/A GEOFFREY MCKENZIE FRANTZ/ UNKNOWN TENANT 1/ UNKNOWN TENANT 2/

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021 - 6.1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A -E-NOTE CERTIFICATE OF AUTHENTICATION/ NOTE/ MORTGAGE / ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE/ NOTICE OF DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 9/8/2023 - id number 2568131

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $1,905.00 AssessmentID 12157853

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketCase 412023CA005160CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 9/7/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less