This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 09/24/2023 at 07:02:43 (UTC).

CAROLYN BAZZI VS FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 CAROLYN BAZZI filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA INC. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD NICHOLAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********40AX

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EDWARD NICHOLAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAROLYN BAZZI

Defendants

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA INC

VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS INC

FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JASON MICHAEL MILLER

Defendant Attorney

DAVID A MERCER

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT'S WITNESS LIST

04/03/2023 - DEFENDANT'S WITNESS LIST

DEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT LIST

04/03/2023 - DEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT LIST

DEFENDANT, FRONTIER FLORIDA, LLC'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

02/17/2023 - DEFENDANT, FRONTIER FLORIDA, LLC'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

01/18/2023 - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/14/2022 - PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

12/05/2022 - AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO AMENDED COMPLAINT - EXHIBITS A-D PHOTOS

10/17/2022 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO AMENDED COMPLAINT - EXHIBITS A-D PHOTOS

PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

04/03/2023 - PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER THE PARTIES ARE EXCUSED FROM SCHEDULING AN INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

12/14/2022 - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER THE PARTIES ARE EXCUSED FROM SCHEDULING AN INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

NOTICE OF ZOOM MEDIATION / 10-27-2023 9:30 AM VIA ZOOM

09/13/2023 - NOTICE OF ZOOM MEDIATION / 10-27-2023 9:30 AM VIA ZOOM

PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

09/11/2023 - PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

DEFENDANT, FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC'S, WITNESS LIST

09/11/2023 - DEFENDANT, FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC'S, WITNESS LIST

DEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT LIST

09/11/2023 - DEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT LIST

DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL' REQUEST FOR A COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION CAROLYN BAZZI, SEPTEMBER 19, 2023 AT 10:00 A.M.

09/07/2023 - DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL' REQUEST FOR A COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION CAROLYN BAZZI, SEPTEMBER 19, 2023 AT 10:00 A.M.

DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION IN MANATEE COUNTY, FLORIDA

09/05/2023 - DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION IN MANATEE COUNTY, FLORIDA

NOTICE OF HEARING SEPTEMBER 7, 2023 AT 2:45 PM VIA ZOOM DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION IN MANATEE COUNTY, FLORIDA

09/01/2023 - NOTICE OF HEARING SEPTEMBER 7, 2023 AT 2:45 PM VIA ZOOM DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION IN MANATEE COUNTY, FLORIDA

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR A COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION IN MANATEE COUNTY, FLORIDA

08/28/2023 - PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR A COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION IN MANATEE COUNTY, FLORIDA

DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR A COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF CAROLYN BAZZI, ON SEPTEMBER 19, 2023 AT 11:00 A.M.

08/18/2023 - DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR A COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF CAROLYN BAZZI, ON SEPTEMBER 19, 2023 AT 11:00 A.M.

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ZOOM MEDIATION / 10-27-2023 9:30 AM VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT, FRONTIER FLORIDA LLC'S, WITNESS LIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT LIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • Hearing09/07/2023 at 02:45PM - JACS-UNLISTED MOTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: NICHOLAS, EDWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL' REQUEST FOR A COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION CAROLYN BAZZI, SEPTEMBER 19, 2023 AT 10:00 A.M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION IN MANATEE COUNTY, FLORIDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING SEPTEMBER 7, 2023 AT 2:45 PM VIA ZOOM DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION IN MANATEE COUNTY, FLORIDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR A COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION IN MANATEE COUNTY, FLORIDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR A COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF CAROLYN BAZZI, ON SEPTEMBER 19, 2023 AT 11:00 A.M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1073297

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 9/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-17.1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA/ VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS INC -- ISSUED 9/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A - THE PREMISES / B- COPY OF XRAY/ FRACTURE / C- ON AUGUST 19, 2020, DR. LAMAR PERFORMED A TOTAL HIP ARTHROPLASTY (REPLACEMENT) OF MRS. BAZZI'S LEFT HIP / D- NO REPAIRS WERE MADE TO THE PREMISES NOR ALTERATIONS TO THE CONDITIONS OF THE PREMISES UNTIL AFTER MS. BAZZI HAS SUFFERED SIMILAR FATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 9/17/2022 - id number 2433705

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11966244

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCase 412022CA003940CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 9/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less