Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/04/2020 at 19:59:34 (UTC).

CARLOS ENRIQUE CORNETTE VS DORA MIRTA ROLDAN

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 CARLOS ENRIQUE CORNETTE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DORA MIRTA ROLDAN. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********87AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARLOS ENRIQUE CORNETTE

Sarasota, FL 34239

Respondent

DORA MIRTA ROLDAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketMAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • Hearing06/18/2020 at 11:00AM - JACS-OTHER MOTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: HEARING ROOM #2 - 3RD FLOOR; Judge: CASKEY, DAVID P;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketSECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING JUNE 18, 2020 TIME: 11:00 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT TRIAL DATE: JUNE 18, 2020 TIME: 11:00 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK ON 3/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketFORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO RELATED CASE FOR JUDGE ASSIGNMENT / TRANSFER TO THE UNIFIED FAMILY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) OR PROPERTY CARLOS ENRIQUE CORNETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketTWELFTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT FAMILY DIVISION RULES OF COURTROOM ETIQUETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER CARLOS ENRIQUE CORNETTE,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketDISCLOSURE FROM NONLAWYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER FOR MANATEE, SARASOTA AND DESOTO COUNTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketFORM A

    Read MoreRead Less