This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 05/13/2023 at 03:08:48 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE NA VS MAUREEN BELFIORE

Case Summary

On 03/06/2023 CAPITAL ONE NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MAUREEN BELFIORE. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********03AX

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE NA

Defendant

MAUREEN BELFIORE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOY LYNN KUNDAWALA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/06/2023 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

03/06/2023 - COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF LEAD COUNSEL OF RECORD

03/06/2023 - NOTICE OF LEAD COUNSEL OF RECORD

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF COMPLAINT -AFFIDAVIT OF SON-MILITARY SERVICE/PAYMENT INFORMATION/ADJUSTMENTS

03/06/2023 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF COMPLAINT -AFFIDAVIT OF SON-MILITARY SERVICE/PAYMENT INFORMATION/ADJUSTMENTS

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL DEFENDANT. CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO MAUREEN BELFIORE 3/9/2023

03/06/2023 - SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL DEFENDANT. CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO MAUREEN BELFIORE 3/9/2023

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED TO MAUREEN BELFIORE 03/11/2023

03/11/2023 - SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED TO MAUREEN BELFIORE 03/11/2023

DEFAULT

04/27/2023 - DEFAULT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

05/04/2023 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

05/04/2023 - AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

05/04/2023 - AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

DEFAULT AND FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

05/08/2023 - DEFAULT AND FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT AND FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketUpdated Event PTC on 4/24/2023 0900 AM Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS results DEFAULTED on 4/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • Hearing04/24/2023 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: DEFAULTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING PLAINTIFF - PRESENT, REPRESENTED BY ROBERT HOFFMAN, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT - NOT PRESENT SERVED DEFAULT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED TO MAUREEN BELFIORE 03/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $310.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1122130; Tender Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL DEFENDANT. CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO MAUREEN BELFIORE 3/9/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF COMPLAINT -AFFIDAVIT OF SON-MILITARY SERVICE/PAYMENT INFORMATION/ADJUSTMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1122130

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 3/6/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketEvent PTC scheduled on 4/24/2023 at 0900 AM, JC - Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS presiding. EventID 1515129

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 3/7/2023 - id number 2493533

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00 AssessmentID 12049986

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCase 412023SC001303SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 3/6/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less