This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 04/01/2023 at 23:03:22 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE NA VS JASPER C KANE

Case Summary

On 03/08/2023 CAPITAL ONE NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JASPER C KANE. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********60AX

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE NA

Defendant

JASPER C KANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SARAH ROSE PUENTE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/08/2023 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT- BREACH OF CONTRACT

03/08/2023 - COMPLAINT- BREACH OF CONTRACT

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

03/08/2023 - NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

COPY OF STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY COURT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

03/08/2023 - COPY OF STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY COURT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT- CAPITAL ONE CUSTOMER AGREEMENT / ACCOUNT SUMMARY

03/08/2023 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT- CAPITAL ONE CUSTOMER AGREEMENT / ACCOUNT SUMMARY

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO BE ISSUED TO JASPER C KANE - ISSUED 3/31/2023

03/28/2023 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO BE ISSUED TO JASPER C KANE - ISSUED 3/31/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO BE ISSUED TO JASPER C KANE - ISSUED 3/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketCompliance Type NCI - FILED was satisfied with Compliance Action - COMPLETED set on 3/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION REVIEWED - DOCUMENTS REDACTED PER NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $310.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1123661; Tender Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketCompliance NCI - FILED has been created with due date of 3/10/2023 - id number 2494907

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1123661

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 3/9/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED. AS OF NOVEMBER 2022 PRETRIAL CONFERENCES ARE BACK TO IN-PERSON HEARINGS. PLEASE VISIT OUR WEBSITE TO OBTAIN CORRECT NOTICE TO APPEAR AT A HEARING IN-PERSON NOT VIA ZOOM. DO NOT PAY FEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY COURT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT- CAPITAL ONE CUSTOMER AGREEMENT / ACCOUNT SUMMARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT- BREACH OF CONTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 3/9/2023 - id number 2494906

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00 AssessmentID 12052198

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketCase 412023SC001360SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 3/8/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less