Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/30/2020 at 16:29:43 (UTC).

CALIANDRA M FIGUEIREDO VS RAFAEL N GUALBERTO

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 CALIANDRA M FIGUEIREDO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RAFAEL N GUALBERTO. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********80AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CALIANDRA M FIGUEIREDO

Respondent

RAFAEL N GUALBERTO

Sarasota, FL 34243

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PETER JOSEPH KROTEC

Respondent Attorney

ANGELA DAVIS TOBAYGO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUED MEDIATION SEPTEMBER 9, 2020, AT 9:00 A.M.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketSTIPULATED ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL -GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF LETTER FROM PETER KROTEC TO JUDGE WHYTE DATE JULY 6, 2020 IN REAGRDS TO PROPOSED STIPULATED ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • Hearing07/07/2020 at 01:30PM - JACS-COMPEL; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: HUDSON, PAUL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • Hearing07/07/2020 at 01:30PM - JACS-COMPEL; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: HEARING ROOM #1 - 3RD FLOOR; Judge: HUDSON, PAUL; Result: CANCELLED-JACS;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING JULY 7, 2020, COMMENCING AT 1:30 P.M.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (LONG FORM).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING JULY 7, 2020, AT 1:30 P.M.,

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketSTANDING ORDER FOR FAMILY LAW CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR SOCIAL INVESTIGATION AND/OR TO APPOINT EVALUATOR TO COMPLETE PARENTING PLAN RECOMMENDATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING STANDARD FAMILY LAW INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION PARENTING CLASS - CALIANDRA M. FIGUEIREDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENTION TO USE EVIDENTIARY SUMMARIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketMINOR CHILDREN QUESTIONNAIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED AS TO RAFAEL N. GUALBERTO - 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PETER JOSEPH KROTEC