This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 10/26/2020 at 12:02:36 (UTC).

BRYCE THOMPSON VS DEPARTMENT OF HIGHWAY SAFETY & MOTOR VEHICLES

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 BRYCE THOMPSON filed an Other lawsuit against DEPARTMENT OF HIGHWAY SAFETY MOTOR VEHICLES. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE and MARK D SINGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********52AX

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE

MARK D SINGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRYCE THOMPSON

Defendant

DEPARTMENT OF HIGHWAY SAFETY & MOTOR VEHICLES

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO ORDER SETTING HEARING

10/21/2020 - RESPONSE TO ORDER SETTING HEARING

ORDER SETTING HEARING ON COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT - DATE: TUESDAY, OCTOBER 27, 2020 TIME: 9:15 A.M. VIA ZOOM

09/30/2020 - ORDER SETTING HEARING ON COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT - DATE: TUESDAY, OCTOBER 27, 2020 TIME: 9:15 A.M. VIA ZOOM

COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

09/25/2020 - COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • Hearing10/27/2020 at 09:15AM - JACS-UNLISTED MOTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: STEELE, JACQUELINE BLANTON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO ORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF EMIAL CORRESPONDENCE BETWEEN THE PARTIES ON THE CASE AND PROOF OF CERTIFIED MAIL - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING ON COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT - DATE: TUESDAY, OCTOBER 27, 2020 TIME: 9:15 A.M. VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$306.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 853971; Tender Amount: $306.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketLETTER EXPLAINING THE NEED FOR TITLE; APPLICATION FOR CERTIFICATE OF TITLE WITH/WITHOUT REGISTRATION; EMAIL CORRESPONDANCE BETWEEN MONTANA DMV AND PLAINTIFF, CERTIFICATE OF DEATH AMERICAN SOUTHERN HOME POLICY DECLARATIONS MARRIAGE RECORD ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less