Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/07/2020 at 07:34:22 (UTC).

BRITTANY GOLF VS MARCO LUCKETT

Case Summary

On 01/14/2020 BRITTANY GOLF filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MARCO LUCKETT. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********23AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRITTANY GOLF

Bradenton, FL 34205

Respondent

MARCO LUCKETT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED MARCO LUCKETT 1/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNEEDS LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF SUMMONS ISSUED TO MARCO LUCKETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER FOR MANATEE, SARASOTA AND DESOTO COUNTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM)- BRITTANY GOLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES- BRITTANY GOLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE- BRITTANY GOLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) OR PROPERTY- BRITTANY GOLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketTWELFTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT FAMILY DIVISION RULES OF COURTROOM ETIQUETTE- BRITTANY GOLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE- BRITTANY GOLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER- BRITTANY GOLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS- GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED- BRITTANY GOLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketBUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS INFORMATION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO RELATED CASE FOR JUDGE ASSIGNMENT / TRANSFER TO THE UNIFIED FAMILY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketFAMILY FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less