This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/06/2020 at 17:13:24 (UTC).

BRIAN KENNETH BRADSHAW VS DANIELLE WALKER

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 BRIAN KENNETH BRADSHAW filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against DANIELLE WALKER. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********04AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRIAN KENNETH BRADSHAW

Respondent

DANIELLE WALKER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

EDWARD BRIAN SOBEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING MOTHER'S CERTIFICATE OF COURSE COMPLETION PARENT EDUCATION AND FAMILY STABILIZATION COURSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION PARENTING AND DIVORCE PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketLETTER TO WHOM IT MAY CONCERN IN REGARDS TO REQUESTING ONLINE PARENTING CLASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING MOTHER/RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE AS TO DANIELLE WALKER SUMMONS SERVED 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$310.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 798868; Tender Amount: $10.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$310.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 798315; Tender Amount: $300.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO RELATED CASE FOR JUDGE ASSIGNMENT / TRANSFER TO THE UNIFIED FAMILY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED AS TO DANIELLE WALKER - 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES - BRIAN BRADSHAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketFATHER/PETITIONER'S PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less