This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/07/2020 at 13:44:54 (UTC).

BRIAN CARSON Et Al VS ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 BRIAN CARSON filed an Other lawsuit against ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK D SINGER and HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********73AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MARK D SINGER

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KATHLEEN RAMAGLIA

BRIAN CARSON

Defendant

ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PIERRE ANDRE LOUIS

Defendant Attorney

DOUGLAS JOHN LAPOINTE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

06/05/2020 - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION

05/06/2020 - ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION

ORDER RE-ASSIGNING CASE TO COUNTY COURT DIVISION 3, THE HONORABLE HEATHER DOYLE,

05/05/2020 - ORDER RE-ASSIGNING CASE TO COUNTY COURT DIVISION 3, THE HONORABLE HEATHER DOYLE,

NOTICE FOR JURY TRIAL

04/20/2020 - NOTICE FOR JURY TRIAL

AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - GRANTED - DEFENDANT HAS UNTIL 5/4/2020 TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

04/16/2020 - AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - GRANTED - DEFENDANT HAS UNTIL 5/4/2020 TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

04/01/2020 - PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

SUMMONS SERVED AS TO STEVEN HONHART ON 3/26/2020

03/27/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED AS TO STEVEN HONHART ON 3/26/2020

DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFSNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF STEVE HONHART. FIELD ADJUSTER (DUCES TECUM PORTION ONLY)

03/23/2020 - DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFSNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF STEVE HONHART. FIELD ADJUSTER (DUCES TECUM PORTION ONLY)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

03/02/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/02/2020 - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY DOUGLAS J. LAPOINTE, ESQ. OBO DEFENDANT, ST. JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

02/26/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY DOUGLAS J. LAPOINTE, ESQ. OBO DEFENDANT, ST. JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.

SUMMONS SERVED ST. JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. ON 02/13/2020

02/14/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED ST. JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. ON 02/13/2020

SUMMONS SERVED ST. JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. ON 02/13/2020

02/13/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED ST. JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. ON 02/13/2020

CIVIL COVER SHEET 2

02/03/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET 2

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

02/03/2020 - COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

02/03/2020 - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: ST. JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY 2/3/2020

02/03/2020 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: ST. JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY 2/3/2020

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/03/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER RE-ASSIGNING CASE TO COUNTY COURT DIVISION 3, THE HONORABLE HEATHER DOYLE,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - GRANTED - DEFENDANT HAS UNTIL 5/4/2020 TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED AS TO STEVEN HONHART ON 3/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFSNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF STEVE HONHART. FIELD ADJUSTER (DUCES TECUM PORTION ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED ST. JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. ON 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$410.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 800878; Tender Amount: $410.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT EXHIBIT A IMPORTANT NOTICE TO POLICYHOLDERS / HOMEOWNERS PREMIUM DUE NOTICE / HOMEOWNERS POLICY DECLARATION RENEWAL / PRIVACY POLICY NOTICE / NOTICE OF PREMIUM DISCOUNTS FOR HURRICANE LOSS MITIGATION / CHECKLIST OF COVERAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: ST. JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY 2/3/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less