This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 04/02/2023 at 13:36:06 (UTC).

BRADENTON CITYWALK LLC VS JEREMY R HITTEL Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 BRADENTON CITYWALK LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JEREMY R HITTEL. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********50AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRADENTON CITYWALK LLC

Defendants

JEREMY R HITTEL

MATHEUS B FERRERIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J CONRAD GRANT

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/31/2023 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

01/31/2023 - COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT- FLORIDA APARTMENT LEASE / THREE DAY NOTICE TO PAY RENT OR DELIVER POSSESSION

01/31/2023 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT- FLORIDA APARTMENT LEASE / THREE DAY NOTICE TO PAY RENT OR DELIVER POSSESSION

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED- JEREMY R. HITTEL 2/1/2023

01/31/2023 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED- JEREMY R. HITTEL 2/1/2023

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED- MATHEUS B. FERRERIA 2/1/2023

01/31/2023 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED- MATHEUS B. FERRERIA 2/1/2023

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING-JEREMY R HITTEL

02/06/2023 - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING-JEREMY R HITTEL

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING-MATHEUS B. FERRERIA

02/06/2023 - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING-MATHEUS B. FERRERIA

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED / MATHEUS B. FERRERIA / 02/03/2023

02/08/2023 - SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED / MATHEUS B. FERRERIA / 02/03/2023

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED / JEREMY R. HITTEL / 02/03/2023

02/08/2023 - SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED / JEREMY R. HITTEL / 02/03/2023

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

02/28/2023 - AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

02/28/2023 - AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION

02/28/2023 - MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION

MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT AS TO JEREMY R HITTEL AND MATHEUS B FERRERIA ENTERED 3/3/2023

02/28/2023 - MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT AS TO JEREMY R HITTEL AND MATHEUS B FERRERIA ENTERED 3/3/2023

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION AS TO COUNT I ONLY FOR POSSESSION - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

03/07/2023 - FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION AS TO COUNT I ONLY FOR POSSESSION - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

WRIT OF POSSESSION -- ISSUED 3/20/23

03/15/2023 - WRIT OF POSSESSION -- ISSUED 3/20/23

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED POSTED / JEREMY R HITTEL AND MATHEUS B FERRERIA AND ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION

03/29/2023 - WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED POSTED / JEREMY R HITTEL AND MATHEUS B FERRERIA AND ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED POSTED / JEREMY R HITTEL AND MATHEUS B FERRERIA AND ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION -- ISSUED 3/20/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION AS TO COUNT I ONLY FOR POSSESSION - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT AS TO JEREMY R HITTEL AND MATHEUS B FERRERIA ENTERED 3/3/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED / JEREMY R. HITTEL / 02/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED / MATHEUS B. FERRERIA / 02/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING-MATHEUS B. FERRERIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1111313

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 2/1/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED- MATHEUS B. FERRERIA 2/1/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED- JEREMY R. HITTEL 2/1/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT- FLORIDA APARTMENT LEASE / THREE DAY NOTICE TO PAY RENT OR DELIVER POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 2/1/2023 - id number 2481767

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00 AssessmentID 12032505

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCase 412023CC000550CCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 1/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less