This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 05/15/2022 at 23:23:31 (UTC).

BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC Et Al VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********60AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC

TRACY BALENTINE

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHONY D BARAK

Defendant Attorney

LYNDSEY C GRIFFIN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/12/2022 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/12/2022 - COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

01/12/2022 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION / TO BE ISSUED TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY - 1/16/2022

01/12/2022 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION / TO BE ISSUED TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY - 1/16/2022

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES LYNDSEY C. GRIFFIN OBO DEFENDANT

02/15/2022 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES LYNDSEY C. GRIFFIN OBO DEFENDANT

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

02/15/2022 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

02/15/2022 - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/07/2022 - DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT'S UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

03/07/2022 - NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT'S UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE AND RELEVANCY LOG

03/07/2022 - DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE AND RELEVANCY LOG

MOTION TO STRIKE OR FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT OF DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

03/24/2022 - MOTION TO STRIKE OR FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT OF DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/24/2022 - DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE OR FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT OF DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE AND RELEVANCY LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT'S UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketUpdated Event PTC on 2/14/2022 0100 PM Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS results CONTINUED on 2/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE "EMAIL" ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION / TO BE ISSUED TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY - 1/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT OF ASSIGNMENT OF BENEFITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 1/13/2022 - id number 2331153

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00 AssessmentID 11827409

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCase 412022SC000260SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 1/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARAK, ANTHONY