This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 01/14/2022 at 22:08:58 (UTC).

BOWES IMAGING CENTER, LLC Et Al VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 BOWES IMAGING CENTER, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********75AX

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOWES IMAGING CENTER, LLC

EDWIN FOX

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHONY D BARAK

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/30/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/30/2021 - COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

11/30/2021 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/1/2021

11/30/2021 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/1/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketUpdated Event PTC on 1/3/2022 0100 PM Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS results CONTINUED on 1/3/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF-REPRESENTED BY BRIAN CRIM, ESQ DEFENDANT-NOT PRESENT CONTINUED PENDING SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • Hearing01/03/2022 at 01:00PM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$185.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 978154; Tender Amount: $185.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE "EMAIL" ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT- BOWES IMAGING CENTER ASSIGNMENT OR BENEFITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 978154

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 11/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent PTC scheduled on 1/3/2022 at 0100 PM, JC - Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS presiding. EventID 1381158

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 12/1/2021 - id number 2311823

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00 AssessmentID 11802580

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCase 412021SC008675SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 11/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARAK, ANTHONY