This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 01/21/2022 at 23:12:43 (UTC).

BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC Et Al VS SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********65AX

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC

EASTON THOMPSON

Defendant

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHONY D BARAK

Defendant Attorney

KRISTAN SMITH COAD

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/18/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/18/2021 - COMPLAINT

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS - 12/7/2021

11/18/2021 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS - 12/7/2021

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

11/18/2021 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

12/20/2021 - DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/29/2021 - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES KRISTAN SMITH COAD, ESQUIRE OBO SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS,

12/29/2021 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES KRISTAN SMITH COAD, ESQUIRE OBO SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS,

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

12/29/2021 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

01/06/2022 - DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES KRISTAN SMITH COAD, ESQUIRE OBO SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event PTC on 12/20/2021 0100 PM Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS results DEFAULTED on 12/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF: REPRESENTED BY BRIAN FORMAN, ESQ DEFENDANT: NOT PRESENT DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • Hearing12/20/2021 at 01:00PM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: DEFAULTED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$310.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 974926; Tender Amount: $310.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS - 12/7/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketBOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC EASTON THOMPSON ASSIGNMENT OF BENEFITS AS ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 974926

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 11/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEvent PTC scheduled on 12/20/2021 at 0100 PM, JC - Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS presiding. EventID 1378366

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 11/19/2021 - id number 2307524

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00 AssessmentID 11796830

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCase 412021SC008465SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 11/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARAK, ANTHONY