This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 01/19/2022 at 23:07:59 (UTC).

BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC Et Al VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MELISSA GOULD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********80AX

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MELISSA GOULD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC

KAYLA DAVIS

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHONY D BARAK

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/23/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/23/2021 - COMPLAINT

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED ON 11/24/2021 AS TO PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

11/23/2021 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED ON 11/24/2021 AS TO PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

11/23/2021 - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

12/22/2021 - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF-REPRESENTED BY BRIAN CRIM, ESQ DEFENDANT-NOT PRESENT APPEARANCE WAIVED-MOTIONS TO BE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketUpdated Event PTC on 1/3/2022 0100 PM Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS results DISMISSED on 1/3/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • Hearing01/03/2022 at 01:00PM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: DISMISSED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$185.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 976721; Tender Amount: $185.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 976721

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 11/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent PTC scheduled on 1/3/2022 at 0100 PM, JC - Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS presiding. EventID 1380018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED ON 11/24/2021 AS TO PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketASSIGNMENT OF BENEFITS ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 11/24/2021 - id number 2310407

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00 AssessmentID 11800550

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCase 412021SC008580SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 11/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARAK, ANTHONY